+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed Ch141.
On March 16, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House (62-0).
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
- Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs Committee.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (36-0).
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules.
- Referred to Senate Rules and Senate Judiciary.
+ − Votes (4)
March 16, 2013: Final House Vote
March 15, 2013: HHGIC Committee Report
March 14, 2013: Final Senate Vote
February 25, 2013: SRC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor