+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute and then do pass; committee report adopted action postponed indefinitely.
- Do not pass; committee report adopted.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs and Senate Judiciary.
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2015: SJC Committee Report
February 16, 2015: SPAC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor