+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed BY GOV (Apr 9) Ch110.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House (65-0).
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs.
- Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs and House Judiciary.
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (42-0).
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs and Senate Judiciary.
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed in Senate.