+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Finance.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Conservation.
- Germane.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committees' Committee.
- Referred to Senate Committees' Committee, Senate Conservation, Senate Corporations & Transportation and Senate Finance.
+ − Votes (3)
February 13, 2014: SCORC Committee Report
February 5, 2014: SCONC Committee Report
January 30, 2014: SCC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor