+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 75 - Mar. 8
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:0
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- HWMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to HWMC - Referrals: HWMC/HAFC
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed in the Senate - Y:31 N:3
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session
- Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SPAC/SFC
+ − Votes (2)
February 17, 2016: Final House Vote
February 6, 2016: Final Senate Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor