+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed House (65-0).
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
- Referred to House Judiciary.
On February 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed BY GOV (Mar 6) Ch 29.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (33-4).
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Finance.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Germane.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committees' Committee.
- Referred to Senate Committees' Committee, Senate Judiciary and Senate Finance.
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2014: Final House Vote
February 18, 2014: HJC Committee Report
February 13, 2014: Final Senate Vote
February 11, 2014: SFC Committee Report
February 4, 2014: SJC Committee Report
January 30, 2014: SCC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor