+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Action Postponed Indefinitely
- Legislative Day: 7Calendar Day: 02/14/2020HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/11/2020Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/11/2020Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0
- Legislative Day: 7Calendar Day: 02/08/2020SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/05/2020SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/29/2020SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/27/2020Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SPAC/SFC