+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 246 - Apr. 4
- Legislative Day: 15Calendar Day: 03/15/2019Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:0
- Legislative Day: 14Calendar Day: 03/14/2019HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 03/08/2019Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC
On December 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Legislative Day: 19Calendar Day: 03/07/2019Passed in the Senate - Y:33 N:7
- Legislative Day: 19Calendar Day: 03/05/2019SFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 02/19/2019SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 1Calendar Day: 01/17/2019Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC/SFC
- Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2019: Final House Vote
March 7, 2019: Final Senate Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor