+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 74 - Mar. 8
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:51 N:13
- HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed in the Senate - Y:27 N:10
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session
- Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SCONC/SJC/SFC
+ − Votes (2)
February 17, 2016: Final Senate Vote
February 17, 2016: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor