+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Pocket Veto
- Legislative Day: 10Calendar Day: 02/15/2018Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:59 N:0
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/14/2018HAWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/13/2018Sent to HAWC - Referrals: HAWC
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Legislative Day: 18Calendar Day: 02/13/2018Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:1
- Legislative Day: 15Calendar Day: 02/10/2018SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 02/06/2018SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 7Calendar Day: 01/25/2018SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 01/24/2018Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SCONC/SFC
+ − Votes (2)
February 15, 2018: Final House Vote
February 13, 2018: Final Senate Vote
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor