+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Finance.
- Committee substitute and then do pass; committee report adopted.
- Do not pass; committee report adopted.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation.
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Conservation.
- Germane.
- Referred to Senate Committees' Committee.
- Referred to Senate Committees' Committee, Senate Conservation, Senate Corporations & Transportation and Senate Finance.
On December 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed in Senate.
+ − Votes (3)
February 13, 2014: SCORC Committee Report
February 5, 2014: SCONC Committee Report
January 27, 2014: SCC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor