+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Passed House (60-0).
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
- Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs.
On February 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed BY GOV (Mar 7) Ch 42.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (42-0).
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Germane.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committees' Committee.
- Referred to Senate Committees' Committee, Senate Public Affairs and Senate Corporations & Transportation.
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2014: Final House Vote
February 19, 2014: HCPAC Committee Report
February 16, 2014: Final Senate Vote
February 13, 2014: SCORC Committee Report
February 7, 2014: SPAC Committee Report
February 3, 2014: SCC Committee Report
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor