+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed BY GOV (Apr 9) Ch106.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House (53-0).
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Education.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (32-1).
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Education.
- Referred to Senate Education and Senate Judiciary.
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed in Senate.
+ − Votes (5)
March 20, 2015: Final House Vote
March 20, 2015: HEC Committee Report
March 16, 2015: Final Senate Vote
February 24, 2015: SJC Committee Report
February 11, 2015: SEC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor