+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:57 N:10
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 21 - Apr. 5
On March 13, 2021 in the House:
- HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SJC
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2021: Final House Vote
March 10, 2021: Final Senate Vote
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor