+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed BY GOV (Apr 6) Ch 44.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House (48-0).
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Ways & Means.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-0).
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation.
- Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation and Senate Public Affairs.
On December 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed in Senate.
+ − Votes (5)
March 19, 2015: Final House Vote
March 19, 2015: HWMC Committee Report
March 16, 2015: Final Senate Vote
March 14, 2015: SPAC Committee Report
March 5, 2015: SCORC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor