+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed.
- Passed Senate (38-0).
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Conservation.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules.
- Referred to Senate Rules and Senate Conservation.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House (45-0).
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Energy, Environment & Natural Resources.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs.
- Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs and House Energy, Environment & Natural Resources.