+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (4)
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 8Calendar Day: 02/13/2018Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
- Legislative Day: 4Calendar Day: 02/01/2018Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:70 N:0
- Legislative Day: 4Calendar Day: 02/01/2018Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/22/2018Not Printed, Not referred to committee, tabled
+ − Vote
February 1, 2018: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor