+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House (70-0).
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations & Finance.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs.
- Referred to House Appropriations & Finance.
- Printed.
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled temporarily by motion.
- Not referred to committee.
- Not printed.
+ − Votes (3)
March 10, 2015: Final House Vote
March 3, 2015: HAFC Committee Report
February 24, 2015: HRPAC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor