+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On December 20, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/22/2020Not Printed, Not referred to committee, tabled
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/06/2020Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/06/2020Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:70 N:0
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/11/2020Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
+ − Vote
February 6, 2020: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsors (6)
Type:
Primary Sponsor