+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed House (70-0).
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
- Referred to House Judiciary.
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
On February 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed.
On January 26, 2014 in the House:
- Tabled temporarily by motion.
- Not referred to committee.
- Not printed.
+ − Votes (2)
February 15, 2014: Final House Vote
February 13, 2014: HJC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor