+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House (46-0).
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations & Finance.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Education.
- Referred to House Education and House Appropriations & Finance.
+ − Votes (3)
March 18, 2015: Final House Vote
March 7, 2015: HAFC Committee Report
March 5, 2015: HEC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Deborah A. Armstrong
Type:
Primary Sponsor