+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action Postponed Indefinitely
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 02/17/2020SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/10/2020Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SFC
On December 17, 2019 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/08/2020Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:44 N:25
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/31/2020HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/27/2020HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/22/2020Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HEC
- Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF