+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Action Postponed Indefinitely
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 02/15/2020Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 7Calendar Day: 02/14/2020Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:68 N:0
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/12/2020HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/06/2020Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC