+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed.
- Passed Senate (41-0).
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
On March 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House (70-0).
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs.
+ − Votes (3)
March 16, 2013: Final Senate Vote
March 11, 2013: Final House Vote
March 8, 2013: HCPAC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor