+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 02/15/2020Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 02/17/2020SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 17Calendar Day: 02/20/2020Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/06/2020Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/11/2020HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 7Calendar Day: 02/14/2020House of Representatives Floor Amendment
- Legislative Day: 7Calendar Day: 02/14/2020Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:2
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2020: Final Senate Vote
February 14, 2020: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor