+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action Postponed Indefinitely
- Legislative Day: 19Calendar Day: 02/14/2018SEC: Reported by committee without a recommendation
- Legislative Day: 18Calendar Day: 02/12/2018Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 7Calendar Day: 02/10/2018Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:60 N:0
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/09/2018HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/02/2018HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/24/2018Referred to: HHHC/HEC
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/24/2018HCal: Bill falls within the purview of a 30 day session and ordered printed
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/24/2018Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
- Legislative Day: 1Calendar Day: 01/16/2018Not Printed
- Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF