+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 5 - Feb. 4
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 01/31/2019Passed in the Senate - Y:31 N:0
- Legislative Day: 4Calendar Day: 01/29/2019SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/24/2019Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
On December 17, 2018 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/23/2019Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:68 N:0
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/22/2019HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/16/2019Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC
- Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF