+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed BY GOV (Apr 6) Ch 39.
- Passed Senate (35-0).
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation.
- Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation and Senate Judiciary.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House (62-0).
- Floor amendment adopted.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Ways & Means.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Safety & Civil Affairs.
- Referred to House Safety & Civil Affairs and House Ways & Means.
On December 30, 2014 in the House:
- Pre-filed in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 20, 2015: Final Senate Vote
March 19, 2015: SJC Committee Report
March 12, 2015: SCORC Committee Report
February 26, 2015: Final House Vote
February 20, 2015: HWMC Committee Report
February 4, 2015: HSCAC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor