+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House (34-31).
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Labor & Human Resources.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs.
- Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs and House Labor & Human Resources.
+ − Votes (3)
March 14, 2013: Final House Vote
March 13, 2013: HLC Committee Report
March 6, 2013: HCPAC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor