+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted action postponed indefinitely.
On March 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Finance.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House (68-0).
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations & Finance.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Education.
- Referred to House Education and House Appropriations & Finance.
+ − Votes (4)
March 15, 2013: SFC Committee Report
March 8, 2013: Final House Vote
March 6, 2013: HAFC Committee Report
March 1, 2013: HEC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor