+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House (68-0).
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Education.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Transportation & Public Works.
- Referred to House Transportation & Public Works and House Education.
+ − Votes (3)
March 10, 2013: Final House Vote
March 8, 2013: HEC Committee Report
February 28, 2013: HTPWC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor