+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed BY GOV (Mar 6) Ch 22.
- Passed Senate (41-0).
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed House (67-0).
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
- Referred to Senate Conservation.
- Referred to Senate Conservation and Senate Judiciary.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Agriculture & Water Resources.
- Referred to House Agriculture & Water Resources and House Judiciary.
On January 2, 2014 in the House:
- Pre-filed in House.
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2014: Final Senate Vote
February 18, 2014: SJC Committee Report
February 16, 2014: SCONC Committee Report
February 13, 2014: Final House Vote
February 11, 2014: HJC Committee Report
January 31, 2014: HAGC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor