+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vetoed.
- Passed Senate (24-17).
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House (38-32).
- Committee substitute and then do pass; committee report adopted.
- Do not pass; committee report adopted.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Education.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Education.
- .
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Labor & Human Resources.
- Referred to House Labor & Human Resources and House Education.
+ − Votes (5)
March 12, 2013: Final Senate Vote
March 9, 2013: SEC Committee Report
March 5, 2013: Final House Vote
March 1, 2013: HEC Committee Report
February 22, 2013: HLC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor