+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/12/2020Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 02/14/2020SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 15Calendar Day: 02/18/2020Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 59 - Mar. 6
On December 18, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/22/2020Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC/HAFC
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/28/2020HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/07/2020HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/11/2020Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:0
+ − Votes (2)
February 18, 2020: Final Senate Vote
February 11, 2020: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor