+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted action postponed indefinitely.
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Education.
- Referred to Senate Education and Senate Judiciary.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House (68-0).
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Education.
- Referred to House Education and House Judiciary.
+ − Votes (4)
March 13, 2013: SJC Committee Report
March 7, 2013: Final House Vote
March 5, 2013: HJC Committee Report
February 25, 2013: HEC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor