+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Conservation.
- Referred to Senate Conservation and Senate Judiciary.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House (33-32).
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs.
- Committee substitute adopted without recommendation.
- Do not pass; committee report adopted.
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Energy, Environment & Natural Resources.
- Referred to House Energy, Environment & Natural Resources and House Regulatory & Public Affairs.
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 2015: Final House Vote
March 7, 2015: HRPAC Committee Report
February 27, 2015: HEENC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Larry R. Scott
Type:
Primary Sponsor