+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action Postponed Indefinitely
- Legislative Day: 19Calendar Day: 03/04/2019Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SJC
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 10Calendar Day: 03/04/2019Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:56 N:11
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/28/2019HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 8Calendar Day: 02/24/2019HJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/11/2019Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC/HAFC