+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Action Postponed Indefinitely
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/11/2020Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SFC
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/10/2020Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:54 N:2
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/08/2020HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/06/2020HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/22/2020Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HAFC
+ − Vote
February 10, 2020: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor