+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vetoed.
- Passed Senate (23-17).
- Committee report adopted without recommendation.
On March 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Education.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House (37-27).
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Education.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Voters & Elections.
- Referred to House Voters & Elections and House Education.
+ − Votes (5)
March 16, 2013: Final Senate Vote
March 13, 2013: SEC Committee Report
March 10, 2013: Final House Vote
March 6, 2013: HEC Committee Report
February 12, 2013: HVEC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor