+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House (38-25).
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Business & Employment.
- Committee substitute and then do pass; committee report adopted.
- Do not pass; committee report adopted.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs.
- Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs and House Business & Employment.
- Referred to House Appropriations & Finance.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs.
- Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs, House Business & Employment and House Appropriations & Finance.
+ − Votes (3)
March 11, 2015: Final House Vote
March 2, 2015: HBEC Committee Report
February 17, 2015: HRPAC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor