+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 157 - Apr. 5
On March 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On March 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC
On March 2, 2023 in the House:
- Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:53 N:12
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC/HTRC
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2023: Final Senate Vote
March 2, 2023: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor