+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 211 - Apr. 3
- Legislative Day: 13Calendar Day: 03/13/2019House has concurred with Senate Amendments
- Legislative Day: 21Calendar Day: 03/08/2019Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0
- Legislative Day: 19Calendar Day: 03/07/2019SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 17Calendar Day: 03/02/2019SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 14Calendar Day: 02/25/2019Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 8Calendar Day: 02/24/2019Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:0
- Legislative Day: 8Calendar Day: 02/21/2019HJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/24/2019Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC