+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action Postponed Indefinitely
- Legislative Day: 21Calendar Day: 03/08/2019SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 15Calendar Day: 02/27/2019Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/26/2019Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:60 N:0
- Legislative Day: 8Calendar Day: 02/24/2019HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/12/2019HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/24/2019Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HJC