+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Action Postponed Indefinitely
- Legislative Day: 10Calendar Day: 03/04/2019HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/25/2019Referred to: HTRC
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/25/2019Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
- Legislative Day: 7Calendar Day: 02/15/2019HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/24/2019Sent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC/HAFC