+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action Postponed Indefinitely
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SFC
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:60 N:0
- HWMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- HBEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Sent to HBEC - Referrals: HBEC/HWMC
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar, ordered printed and referred to
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Not Printed
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF
+ − Vote
February 4, 2016: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor