+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action Postponed Indefinitely
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0
- HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- HSCAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to HSCAC - Referrals: HSCAC/HJC
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar, ordered printed and referred to
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Not Printed
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF