+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed BY GOV (Apr 7) Ch 66.
- Passed Senate (40-0).
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation.
- Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation and Senate Judiciary.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House (63-0).
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations & Finance.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs.
- Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs and House Appropriations & Finance.
+ − Votes (6)
March 21, 2015: Final Senate Vote
March 17, 2015: SJC Committee Report
March 14, 2015: SCORC Committee Report
March 5, 2015: Final House Vote
March 2, 2015: HAFC Committee Report
February 20, 2015: HGEIC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Conrad D. James
Type:
Primary Sponsor