+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 235 - Apr. 4
- Legislative Day: 23Calendar Day: 03/14/2019Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0
- Legislative Day: 21Calendar Day: 03/09/2019SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 19Calendar Day: 03/06/2019SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 14Calendar Day: 02/25/2019Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SCORC
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 8Calendar Day: 02/25/2019Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0
- Legislative Day: 8Calendar Day: 02/21/2019HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/12/2019HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/21/2019Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HCEDC
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2019: Final Senate Vote
February 25, 2019: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor