+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 72 - Mar. 8
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- House has concurred with Senate Amendments
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SJC
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:0
- HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar, ordered printed and referred to
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Not Printed
+ − Votes (2)
February 17, 2016: Final Senate Vote
February 8, 2016: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor