+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 18 - Feb. 4
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 01/31/2019Passed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 01/30/2019SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/24/2019Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/23/2019Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:0
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/22/2019HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/17/2019Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC